RI H5273 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DBR to conduct social/racial equity analysis on issuance of business licenses to include license to sell marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act -- The Rhode Island Cannabis Equity Act Of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2021)
2021-04-02HouseCommittee transferred to House State Government & Elections
2021-01-29HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback