RI H5273 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the date of the annual meeting of the Coventry Fire District from the second Tuesday of December to the second Wednesday of November.
Title
Relating To The Coventry Fire District
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2017-05-03 | House | House read and passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/03/2017) |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2017) |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |