RI H5269 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents the forced sale of real estate owned by persons who owe fire, water, sewer, road or lighting district charges.
Title
Collection Of Tax Sales --water Supply -- Water And Sewer Charges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5269.pdf |