RI H5267 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates March 25 in each and every year as Medal of Honor Day.
Title
Days Of Special Observance -- Medal Of Honor Day
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5267.pdf |