RI H5264 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the moratorium on penalties related to COVID-19 modifications to food business or food service establishments to February 15, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning Ordinances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Committee on Small Business: Passage of Sub A (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30HouseSigned by Governor
2023-03-29HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-03-28SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/28/2023)
2023-03-16HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-03-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/16/2023)
2023-03-08HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-03-03HouseProposed Substitute
2023-03-03HouseScheduled for consideration (03/07/2023)
2023-02-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-02-03HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2023)
2023-01-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Small Business

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback