RI H5260 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a municipality to disclose on their official website the specific issues, details and costs of any legal action of which the town or city is a named defendant.
Title
Actions By And Against Towns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2023) |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5260.pdf |