RI H5258 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Stone Bridge fire district to borrow up to $100,000 in funds to meet specific short-term financial obligations.
Title
In Amendment Of Chapter 974 Of The Public Laws Of 1940, Entitled "to Incorporate The Stone Bridge Fire District And To Furnish A Supply Of Water For The Town Of Tiverton"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2021-06-15 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |