RI H5257 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Probate Practice And Procedure - Practice In Probate Courts (would Remove The Requirement Of Notifying The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services When A Decedent Was Fifty-five (55) Years Or Older, When Petitioning For The Probate Of A Will Or Administration Of An Estate)
Title
An Act Relating To Probate Practice And Procedure - Practice In Probate Courts (would Remove The Requirement Of Notifying The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services When A Decedent Was Fifty-five (55) Years Or Older, When Petitioning For The Probate Of A Will Or Administration Of An Estate)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-05-28 | House | House read and passed |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2013) |
2013-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2013) |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5257.pdf |