RI H5256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle dealers to disclose in writing that a vehicle being sold has a spare tire/ jack or is otherwise equipped in compliance with applicable law. There shall be a civil penalty of $100 for a violation under this subsection.
Title
Dealerships
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2019-03-27 | House | House read and passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019) |
2019-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/12/2019) |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |