RI H5253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that instruction in health and physical education include information provided to students that mixing opioids and alcohol can cause accidental death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Curriculum [see Title 16 Chapter 97 -- The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Senate Education
2019-03-21HouseHouse read and passed
2019-03-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/21/2019)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for consideration (03/13/2019)
2019-02-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019)
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback