RI H5252 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the towns of Warren and Bristol from school bus district Region III and places Warren and Bristol in school bus district Region V.
Title
Transportation Of School Pupils Beyond City And Town Limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2023) |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5252.pdf |