RI H5251 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-26 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/29/2023)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-26 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/29/2023)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public high schools to offer as part of the curriculum a nutrition food preparation and cooking course. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/29/2023) |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5251.pdf |