RI H5247 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes hospital medical staff to elect whether or not to participate in a maintenance of certification program, to elect medical specialty board to implement the program and prohibits insurers from denying reimbursement based solely on this election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019)
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback