RI H5246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any law or regulation which protects a person from exposure to second hand smoke would also provide protection from exposure to second-hand marijuana smoke, regardless of how the smoke was generated.
Title
Public Health And Workplace Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5246.pdf |