RI H5243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitates state departments/agencies to implement electronic filing of applications for licenses/permits/ registrations/certificates by allowing state vendor to withhold commission for developing and implementing electronic filing web-based system.
Title
Payment Of Statutory Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Mario Mendez [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5243.pdf |