RI H5234 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires municipality comprehensive plans to include present and future interests of the school system including curriculum and instruction as well as buildings, transportation routes, fields, playgrounds, sidewalks, raised crosswalks and parking lots.
Title
Rhode Island Comprehensive Planning And Land Use Act
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2017) |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5234.pdf |