RI H5229 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any operator of a motorcycle, motor scooter or motor-driven cycle to wear a helmet. Violations would be punished by a fine of $100 and would increase the fines for failure of a passenger to wear a helmet to $100.
Title
Special License For Motorcycles, Motor Scooters And Other Motor-driven Cycles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2023) |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5229.pdf |