RI H5228 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Meeting postponed (06/26/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Meeting postponed (06/26/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes licensed school psychologists under the provisions of the general laws governing the regulations of psychologists.
Title
Psychologists
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Meeting postponed (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-26 | House | Meeting postponed (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019) |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5228.pdf |