RI H5223 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the state lottery division of the department of revenue to enter into a contract extension with IGT Global Solutions Corporation and contract extensions with Twin River and affiliates of Twin River.
Title
Relating To Enabling The State Lottery Division Of The Department Of Revenue To Contract With Igt Global Solutions Corporation And Twin River
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 6 N: 46 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 8 N: 49 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 51 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 6 N: 52 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 7 N: 48 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 7 N: 50 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 16 N: 45 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 54 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 6 N: 46 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 8 N: 49 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 51 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 6 N: 52 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 7 N: 48 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 7 N: 50 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 16 N: 45 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 54 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2021-05-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-04 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |