RI H5220 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Identify Theft Protection Act of 2015, to protect personal information from unauthorized access, use, modification, destruction or disclosure, and to preserve the confidentiality and integrity of such information.
Title
Identity Theft Protection
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2015) |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/24/2015) |
2015-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |