RI H5208 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Meeting postponed (02/14/2017)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Meeting postponed (02/14/2017)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the death penalty in situations where first responders are murdered by way of ambush.
Title
Homicide
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Meeting postponed (02/14/2017) |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5208.pdf |