RI H5204 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires every electric distribution company and natural gas distribution company to submit to the division of public utilities and carriers an emergency response plan for review and approval.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing (04/01/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |