RI H5198 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines light duty, non-emergency, emergency and zero-emission vehicles and requires the state to convert its fleet of vehicles to no less than fifty percent (50%) of vehicles in those categories by the year 2031.
Title
Department Of Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Megan Cotter [D] |
Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2023) |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5198.pdf |