RI H5197 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the labeling of all raw and packaged food that is entirely or partially produced with genetic engineering, commencing January 1, 2016.
Title
Genetically Engineered Raw And Packaged Food Labeling Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2015) |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5197.pdf |