RI H5194 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the interstate nurse licensure compact and adopts an enhanced, more comprehensive version of the compact, allowing nurses to hold a multi-state license which would allow them to practice across state lines without having to obtain multiple licenses
Title
Nurse Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2021) |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/09/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5194.pdf |