RI H5193 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits to the creation of new district charter schools, independent charter schools, and mayoral academy’s. Mandates state to not appropriate funding for charter schools.
Title
Establishment Of Charter Schools
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2021) |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Education |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5193.pdf |