RI H5188 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the sale, offer of sale, trade or distribution of fur products as defined and makes any violation punishable by a fine of five hundred dollars ($500) up to five thousand dollars ($5,000) and up to one year in jail.
Title
Trade In Animal Fur Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2021) |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-06 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/09/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |