RI H5186 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the process of nominating candidates for the general election, by replacing the political party primary with a primary general election.
Title
Primary Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5186.pdf |