RI H5185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/24/2021)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/24/2021)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a licensed buyer of certain precious metals or articles, tools, and electronics to take a digital photograph of their purchase and upload it to the attorney general's license sales tracking system database.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2021) |
2021-02-06 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/09/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5185.pdf |