RI H5182 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property - Form And Effect Of Conveyances (would Add A Daily Statewide Newspaper To The Publications That May Be Used For Notice In Mortgage Defaults)
Title
An Act Relating To Property - Form And Effect Of Conveyances (would Add A Daily Statewide Newspaper To The Publications That May Be Used For Notice In Mortgage Defaults)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2013) |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2013) |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5182.pdf |