RI H5180 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes that municipal employees have the opportunity to utilize interest arbitration and would establish new factors for the arbitrators to consider. These factors include comparisons of wages/hourly conditions of employment in similarly skilled jobs.
Title
Municipal Employees' Arbitration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5180.pdf |