RI H5174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Places oversight of freshwater lakes, streams, and ponds in the fish and wildlife division of the department of environmental management.
Title
Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-09-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |