RI H5170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a provisional employee in classified service, who has satisfactorily served in their position for more than five (5) consecutive years, to be deemed qualified to be awarded permanent status in that position, without the need of examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Merit System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-27SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019)
2019-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for consideration (06/05/2019)
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Senate Labor
2019-04-30HouseHouse read and passed
2019-04-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/30/2019)
2019-04-03HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-03-29HouseScheduled for consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-01-31HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2019)
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback