RI H5166 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that enrollees in the Rhode Island best RX Prescription drug discount program for the uninsured are not charged a copay for their prescriptions.
Title
Rhode Island Best Rx Prescription Drug Discount Program For The Uninsured
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5166.pdf |