RI H5162 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that when the governor declares a state of emergency requiring the closing of schools, the lost day would not be made up at the end of the school year.
Title
Emergency Reduction Of School Year
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2017) |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5162.pdf |