RI H5159 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - House passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Requires installation of designated electric vehicle parking spaces, with charging capabilities, by certain business/ municipalities/housing developments in existing/new/expanded parking lots as of 1/1/24.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parking Facilities And Privileges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-15HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2023-06-13HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-06-12HouseScheduled for consideration (06/13/2023)
2023-02-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023)
2023-01-19HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback