RI H5157 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that every superintendent of schools shall create an annual report on the progress and status of academic achievement of foster care youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Curriculum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-07HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-21SenateScheduled for consideration (06/23/2021)
2021-06-09SenateCommittee heard
2021-06-04SenateScheduled for hearing (06/09/2021)
2021-06-04SenateReferred to Senate Education
2021-05-25HouseHouse passed Sub A
2021-05-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/25/2021)
2021-05-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-05-14HouseProposed Substitute
2021-05-14HouseScheduled for consideration (05/19/2021)
2021-02-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/10/2021)
2021-02-02HouseCommittee transferred to House Education
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback