RI H5151 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a plan for the gradual ban on the use of disposable plastic checkout bags by retail establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plastic Waste Reduction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2015)
2015-01-21HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback