RI H5147 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires department of health to establish an informal dispute resolution to address any changes to department of health violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-26HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2023-06-09SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2023)
2023-05-15SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2023-03-09HouseHouse read and passed
2023-03-03HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/09/2023)
2023-02-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-02-24HouseScheduled for consideration (02/28/2023)
2023-02-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-02-03HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2023)
2023-01-18HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback