RI H5146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all health insurance providers offering prescription drug benefits to limit person’s out-of-pocket costs to$100 for 30 day supply. Commencing 1/1/22.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5146.pdf |