RI H5146 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage for annual pediatric mental health examinations when ordered by a physician.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019) |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5146.pdf |