RI H5141 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - House passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - House passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts out-of-state food processors and wholesalers from the five hundred dollar ($500) fee charged to food processors and wholesalers by the department of health.
Title
Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015) |
2015-03-03 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |