RI H5138 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles from excise taxes.
Title
Excise On Motor Vehicles And Trailers
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5138.pdf |