RI H5135 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the board of social work examiners shall use online and internet resources in establishing standards for continuing education for social workers.
Title
License Procedure For Social Workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2015) |
2015-01-28 | House | Meeting postponed (01/28/2015) |
2015-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5135.pdf |