RI H5132 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the compliance standards for heating oil biobased products providing minimum standards for the percentage of biobased product that certain types of heating oil must contain.
Title
Biodiesel Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2021-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-04 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |