RI H5132 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies the Home Rule Charter amendments adopted and approved by the electors of North Smithfield on November 6, 2018.
Title
Relating To The Town Of North Smithfield
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-05-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/22/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2019-02-13 | House | House read and passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/13/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/07/2019) |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2019) |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |