RI H5132 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cuts in half the amount of property and personal injury motor vehicle mandatory insurance coverage that taxicab companies are required to maintain on their vehicles.
Title
Taxicab's Financial Responsibilities
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2017) |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5132.pdf |