RI H5130 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Gradually increases the minimum wage from eleven dollars and fifty cents ($11.50) per hour to fifteen dollars ($15.00) per hour, over a four (4) year period.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 49 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Passage (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Committee on Labor: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 49 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Passage (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Committee on Labor: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2021-05-06 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-04-23 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-04-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/28/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |