RI H5130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the practice of importing a wild animal into the state, which animal is not native or indigenous to the state, for the purpose of conducting canned hunting.
Title
Relating To Fish And Wildlife
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5130.pdf |