RI H5129 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes a penalty against a condominium association that fails to deliver a resale certificate within ten (10) days of a request by a unit owner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resale Of Units

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019)
2019-01-29HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (01/29/2019)
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback